THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:35:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 853-2888
Fax: (905) 853-6607

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Fell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fell (CPSO#: 50542 )
Business Address: Suite 208
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
(905) 853-2888

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 853-2888
Fax: (905) 853-6607

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Fell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fell (CPSO#: 50542 )
Business Address: Suite 208
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
(905) 853-2888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ASHLEY FELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ASHLEY FELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982