THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: H Wing Room 405
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6073
Fax: (416) 480-4439

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 23 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fremes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fremes (CPSO#: 50594 )
Business Address: H405 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6073

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: H Wing Room 405
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6073
Fax: (416) 480-4439

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 23 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fremes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fremes (CPSO#: 50594 )
Business Address: H405 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6073

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN EDWARD FREMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREMES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN EDWARD FREMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREMES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979