THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 06:12:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1131A Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M3C 3L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-3607-360
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 08 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Magdi M. Gaid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gaid (CPSO#: 50606 )
Business Address: 300-1131A Leslie St
North York ON M3C 3L8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1131A Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M3C 3L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-3607-360
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 08 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Magdi M. Gaid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gaid (CPSO#: 50606 )
Business Address: 300-1131A Leslie St
North York ON M3C 3L8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAGDI MILAD AZIZ GAID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAGDI MILAD AZIZ GAID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1982
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 1982