THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:09:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 645-2929
Fax: (416) 645-2930
Address: Maple
n/a- house calls
Toronto Ontario M5V 2Y1
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 11 Sep 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Loren D. Grossman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Grossman (CPSO#: 50646 )
Business Address: LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 645-2929

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 645-2929
Fax: (416) 645-2930
Address: Maple
n/a- house calls
Toronto Ontario M5V 2Y1
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 11 Sep 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Loren D. Grossman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Grossman (CPSO#: 50646 )
Business Address: LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 645-2929

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOREN DAVID GROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOREN DAVID GROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982