THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:56:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Albany Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maha Dutil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dutil (CPSO#: 50684 )
Business Address: 807 Broadview Avenue
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
(416) 461-9471

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Albany Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maha Dutil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dutil (CPSO#: 50684 )
Business Address: 807 Broadview Avenue
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
(416) 461-9471

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHA DUTIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUTIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHA DUTIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUTIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982