THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:15:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1975
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Gerrard Wing
3rd Floor Room 562
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3324
Fax: (416) 340-3352

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 04 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Louise Harris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Harris (CPSO#: 50686 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Suite 3-562, Gerrard Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3324

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Gerrard Wing
3rd Floor Room 562
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3324
Fax: (416) 340-3352

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 04 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Louise Harris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Harris (CPSO#: 50686 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Suite 3-562, Gerrard Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3324

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUISE HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUISE HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 1982