THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:51:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1151 Richmond St
Robarts Research Institute - Western University
4288-A
London ON N6A 5B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199315271
Fax: 5199315218

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 11 Sep 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert A. Hegele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hegele (CPSO#: 50701 )
Business Address: 260 Regent Street
London Ontario N6A 2H2
(519) 931-5271
Business Address: 1-1151 Richmond St
Robarts Research Institute - Western University
4288-A
London ON N6A 5B7
519-931-5271

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1151 Richmond St
Robarts Research Institute - Western University
4288-A
London ON N6A 5B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199315271
Fax: 5199315218

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 11 Sep 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert A. Hegele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hegele (CPSO#: 50701 )
Business Address: 260 Regent Street
London Ontario N6A 2H2
(519) 931-5271
Business Address: 1-1151 Richmond St
Robarts Research Institute - Western University
4288-A
London ON N6A 5B7
519-931-5271

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT ALEXANDER HEGELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGELE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT ALEXANDER HEGELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGELE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981