THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:37:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Unit B 722
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4680
Fax: (416) 480-4751

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elaine Herer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Herer (CPSO#: 50709 )
Business Address: B722 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4680

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Unit B 722
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4680
Fax: (416) 480-4751

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elaine Herer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Herer (CPSO#: 50709 )
Business Address: B722 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4680

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELAINE RANDY HERER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELAINE RANDY HERER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982