THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:17:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 343
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 494-6155
Fax: (416) 494-0010
Address: 18 Wynford Dr
North York ON M3C 3S2
Phone: 4164947455
Fax: 4164944833
Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 867-7422
Fax: (416) 867-3688
Address: 2065 Finch Avenue West
North Toronto Eye Care
Suite 400
M3N 2V7
Toronto Ontario M3N 1W8
Phone: 416 748 2020
Fax: 416 748 2020

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 25 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dale Gray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gray (CPSO#: 50729 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 343
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 494-6155
Fax: (416) 494-0010
Address: 18 Wynford Dr
North York ON M3C 3S2
Phone: 4164947455
Fax: 4164944833
Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 867-7422
Fax: (416) 867-3688
Address: 2065 Finch Avenue West
North Toronto Eye Care
Suite 400
M3N 2V7
Toronto Ontario M3N 1W8
Phone: 416 748 2020
Fax: 416 748 2020

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 25 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dale Gray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gray (CPSO#: 50729 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALE ELLEN GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALE ELLEN GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982