THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:48:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Professional Building
95 Bayly Street West
Suite 206
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 619-8778
Fax: (905) 619-8998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Konn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Konn (CPSO#: 50735 )
Business Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: Medical Professional Building
206 - 95 Bayly Street West
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8
(905) 619-8778

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Professional Building
95 Bayly Street West
Suite 206
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 619-8778
Fax: (905) 619-8998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Konn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Konn (CPSO#: 50735 )
Business Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: Medical Professional Building
206 - 95 Bayly Street West
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8
(905) 619-8778

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE KONN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE KONN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1985

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 1984

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980