THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:39:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre
Blue Team (3rd Floor 77 Grenville St.)
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-323-6060 x 3, 4
Fax: 416-323-6402

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Stephen Holzapfel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Holzapfel (CPSO#: 50789 )
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Team 7
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6244

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre
Blue Team (3rd Floor 77 Grenville St.)
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-323-6060 x 3, 4
Fax: 416-323-6402

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Stephen Holzapfel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Holzapfel (CPSO#: 50789 )
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Team 7
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6244

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE STEPHEN HOLZAPFEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLZAPFEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE STEPHEN HOLZAPFEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLZAPFEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982