THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:59:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Central de Venezuela, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Health - Greater Niagara General Hospital
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luis Flores Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Flores (CPSO#: 50814 )
Business Address: PO Box 30081 Rpo Ridley Square
St Catharines ON L2S 4A1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Central de Venezuela, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Health - Greater Niagara General Hospital
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luis Flores Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Flores (CPSO#: 50814 )
Business Address: PO Box 30081 Rpo Ridley Square
St Catharines ON L2S 4A1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUIS ANTONIO FLORES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLORES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUIS ANTONIO FLORES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLORES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Central de Venezuela, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 1987

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 1986
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 1986

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 1986

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981