THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:43:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 William Graham Drive
Unit 29
Aurora Ontario L4G 7C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 505-6555
Fax: 905 505-2555
Address: 29-555 William Graham Dr
Aurora ON L4G 3L1
Phone: 9055056555
Fax: 9055052555

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Jim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jim (CPSO#: 50852 )
Business Address: 716 The Queensway S
Keswick ON L4P 4C9
9054760308
Business Address: 1124 Quaker Trail
Newmarket ON L3X 3E2
9059531023
Business Address: Woodbine Medical Centre
Building B Unit 9
76 Arlington Drive
Keswick Ontario L4P 0A9
(905) 476-0308

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 William Graham Drive
Unit 29
Aurora Ontario L4G 7C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 505-6555
Fax: 905 505-2555
Address: 29-555 William Graham Dr
Aurora ON L4G 3L1
Phone: 9055056555
Fax: 9055052555

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Jim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jim (CPSO#: 50852 )
Business Address: 716 The Queensway S
Keswick ON L4P 4C9
9054760308
Business Address: 1124 Quaker Trail
Newmarket ON L3X 3E2
9059531023
Business Address: Woodbine Medical Centre
Building B Unit 9
76 Arlington Drive
Keswick Ontario L4P 0A9
(905) 476-0308

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARRY JIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARRY JIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982