THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:01:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
Harrison Hall
Brock University
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 3A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-688-5550
Extension: 3791
Fax: 18559150253

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. G. Josefchak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Josefchak (CPSO#: 50864 )
Business Address: Suite 306
180 Vine Street South
St Catharines Ontario L2R 7P3
(855) 210-0757 Extn: 510
Business Address: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
Brock University Athletic Injuries Clinic
Harrison Hall
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 3A1
9056885550,1,3791
Business Address: 201-180 Vine St S
St Catharines ON L2R 7P3
8552100757 Extn: 510
Business Address: 201-180 Vine St S
St Catharines ON L2R 7P3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
Harrison Hall
Brock University
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 3A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-688-5550
Extension: 3791
Fax: 18559150253

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. G. Josefchak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Josefchak (CPSO#: 50864 )
Business Address: Suite 306
180 Vine Street South
St Catharines Ontario L2R 7P3
(855) 210-0757 Extn: 510
Business Address: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
Brock University Athletic Injuries Clinic
Harrison Hall
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 3A1
9056885550,1,3791
Business Address: 201-180 Vine St S
St Catharines ON L2R 7P3
8552100757 Extn: 510
Business Address: 201-180 Vine St S
St Catharines ON L2R 7P3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT GEORGE JOSEFCHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEFCHAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT GEORGE JOSEFCHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEFCHAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982