THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:15:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 505 O' Connor Street
Ottawa Ontario K1S 3P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 230-5958
Fax: (613) 230-1612
Address: CHEO CF Clinic
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2214
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kathryn Keely Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Keely (CPSO#: 50896 )
Business Address: 505 O' Connor Street
Ottawa Ontario K1S 3P6
(613) 230-5958

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 505 O' Connor Street
Ottawa Ontario K1S 3P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 230-5958
Fax: (613) 230-1612
Address: CHEO CF Clinic
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2214
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kathryn Keely Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Keely (CPSO#: 50896 )
Business Address: 505 O' Connor Street
Ottawa Ontario K1S 3P6
(613) 230-5958

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN LEONE KEELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEELY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN LEONE KEELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEELY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1980