THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:03:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford Ontario N3S 6T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 753-9221
Fax: (519) 756-8839

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 21 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Leung (CPSO#: 50927 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford Ontario N3S 6T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 753-9221
Fax: (519) 756-8839

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 21 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Leung (CPSO#: 50927 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILSON WAI-SHING LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILSON WAI-SHING LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1978