THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:35:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leveille Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Leveille (CPSO#: 50928 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leveille Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Leveille (CPSO#: 50928 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY LOUISE LEVEILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVEILLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY LOUISE LEVEILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVEILLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982