THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:41:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Angeline Street North
Kawartha Lakes Ontario K9V 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053285381
Fax: 8556322853

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records management Ltd
1 High Meadow Pl Unit 13,
Toronto
ON M9L 0A3

1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 29 Feb 2024

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graham Loeb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Loeb (CPSO#: 50943 )
Business Address: 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Angeline Street North
Kawartha Lakes Ontario K9V 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053285381
Fax: 8556322853

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records management Ltd
1 High Meadow Pl Unit 13,
Toronto
ON M9L 0A3

1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 29 Feb 2024

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graham Loeb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Loeb (CPSO#: 50943 )
Business Address: 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAHAM JOHN LOEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOEB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAHAM JOHN LOEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOEB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981