THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:21:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12 Main St. North
Canadian Centre for Integrative Medicine
Ground Floor
Markham Ontario L3P 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054719355
Fax: 9054714348

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 28 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St John's Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon D. Ko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hum (CPSO#: 62463 ) Dr. G. Ko (CPSO#: 50980 )
Business Address: Canadian Centre Integrative Medicine
12 Main Street North
Markham Ontario L3P 1X2
(905) 471-9355

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12 Main St. North
Canadian Centre for Integrative Medicine
Ground Floor
Markham Ontario L3P 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054719355
Fax: 9054714348

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 28 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St John's Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon D. Ko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hum (CPSO#: 62463 ) Dr. G. Ko (CPSO#: 50980 )
Business Address: Canadian Centre Integrative Medicine
12 Main Street North
Markham Ontario L3P 1X2
(905) 471-9355

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON DICKMAN KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON DICKMAN KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982