THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:33:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 216
350 Sparks Street
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 237-3166
Fax: (613) 567-1160

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 19 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Konzuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Konzuk (CPSO#: 50989 )
Business Address: Suite 216
350 Sparks Street
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7S8
(613) 737-3166

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 216
350 Sparks Street
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 237-3166
Fax: (613) 567-1160

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 19 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Konzuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Konzuk (CPSO#: 50989 )
Business Address: Suite 216
350 Sparks Street
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7S8
(613) 737-3166

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER JOHN KONZUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONZUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER JOHN KONZUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONZUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982