THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:09:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Addiction Services
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 2N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 834-4501
Extension: 32542
Fax: (905) 834-4493

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Craig J. Kuhn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kuhn (CPSO#: 51005 )
Business Address: Niagara Addiction Services
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 2N7
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z2
(905) 378-4647

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Addiction Services
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 2N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 834-4501
Extension: 32542
Fax: (905) 834-4493

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Craig J. Kuhn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kuhn (CPSO#: 51005 )
Business Address: Niagara Addiction Services
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 2N7
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z2
(905) 378-4647

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRAIG JOSEPH KUHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUHN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRAIG JOSEPH KUHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUHN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981