THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:12:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kashmir University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KASHMIRI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Arts Building
1 Young Street
Suite 413
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 577-4670
Fax: (905) 577-6204

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Subash Jalali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jalali (CPSO#: 51011 )
Business Address: Medical Arts Building
1 Young Street
Suite 413
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
(905) 577-4670

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KASHMIRI, URDU
Medical School: Kashmir University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Arts Building
1 Young Street
Suite 413
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 577-4670
Fax: (905) 577-6204

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Subash Jalali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jalali (CPSO#: 51011 )
Business Address: Medical Arts Building
1 Young Street
Suite 413
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
(905) 577-4670

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUBASH JALALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JALALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUBASH JALALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JALALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kashmir University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982