THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:54:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 239 Oxford Street
London Ontario N6A 1V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 433-2242
Fax: (519) 645-7565

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 25 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Lyttle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lyttle (CPSO#: 51029 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 239 Oxford Street
London Ontario N6A 1V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 433-2242
Fax: (519) 645-7565

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 25 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Lyttle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lyttle (CPSO#: 51029 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN DOUGLAS LYTTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYTTLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN DOUGLAS LYTTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYTTLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 1981