THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:15:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1300 Keith Ross Dr
Oshawa ON L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057214931
Fax: 9057216643
Address: 1461 Harwood Avenue North
Ajax Ontario L1T 4T9
Phone: 905 728 1673
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1461 Harwood Avenue North
Grandview Kids Ajax
Ajax Ontario L1T 4T9
Phone: (905) 728-1673
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 872 Dutton Road
Peterborough Ontario K9H 7G1
Phone: 18887799916
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 01 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.C. Mason Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mason (CPSO#: 51048 )
Business Address: 872 Dutton Rd
Peterborough ON K9H 7G1
Business Address: 13175 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 0G6
Business Address: 600 Townline Road South
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K6
Business Address: 1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1J 0C7
(905) 721-4300 Extn: 5269
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Address: 872 Dutton Road
Peterborough Ontario K9H 7G1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1300 Keith Ross Dr
Oshawa ON L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057214931
Fax: 9057216643
Address: 1461 Harwood Avenue North
Ajax Ontario L1T 4T9
Phone: 905 728 1673
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1461 Harwood Avenue North
Grandview Kids Ajax
Ajax Ontario L1T 4T9
Phone: (905) 728-1673
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 872 Dutton Road
Peterborough Ontario K9H 7G1
Phone: 18887799916
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 01 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.C. Mason Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mason (CPSO#: 51048 )
Business Address: 872 Dutton Rd
Peterborough ON K9H 7G1
Business Address: 13175 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 0G6
Business Address: 600 Townline Road South
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K6
Business Address: 1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1J 0C7
(905) 721-4300 Extn: 5269
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Address: 872 Dutton Road
Peterborough Ontario K9H 7G1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK CHRISTOPHER MASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK CHRISTOPHER MASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982