THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:42:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Otago, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Extension: 48000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ontario Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 302
1315 Finch Avenue West
North York Ontario M3J 2G6
Phone: (416) 634-0001
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 300 York Mills Road
North York Ontario M2L 2Y5
Phone: (416) 391-4452
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 300
1131A Leslie Street
North York Ontario M3C 3L8
Phone: (416) 527-2263
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Crescent Oral Surgery
Suite 400
9251 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9T3
Phone: (905) 889-8806
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1188B Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6C 2E3
Phone: (416) 785-7864
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 505
3200 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B2
Phone: (416) 256-9500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 602
1235 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3K4
Phone: (416) 928-3444
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Freilich Dental Associates
55 St. Clair Ave. W. #125
Toronto Ontario M4V2Y7
Phone: (416) 789-5335
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Herzig Eye Clinic
Suite 210
131 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M5S 1R1
Phone: (416) 929-2020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 201
1490 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1N4
Phone: (416) 461-0424
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 31
70 Yorkville Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3R 1B9
Phone: (647) 343-0207
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 08 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grant Maxted Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Maxted (CPSO#: 51055 )
Business Address: 101 - 133 Hazelton Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5R 0A6
Business Address: 1089 Kingston Road
Toronto Ontario M1N 4E4
Business Address: 210 - 131 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M5R 1R1
(416) 929-2020
Business Address: 125-55 St. Clair West
Toronto Ontario M5S 1R1
Business Address: 343-50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3C2
Business Address: 301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3
(416) 486-8088
Business Address: 201 - 1490 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1N4
(416) 461-0424
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Address: 300 York Mills Road
North York Ontario M2L 2Y5
(416) 391-4452
Business Address: 251 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1J9
Business Address: 250 Canarctic Drive
North York Ontario M3J 2P4
Business Address: 400 - 9251 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9T3
(905) 889-8006
Business Address: 1188B Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6C 2E3
(416) 785-7864
Business Address: 214-10 York Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M2P 2G4
Business Address: 700-59 Hayden Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2P2
Business Address: 602 - 1235 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3K4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Otago, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Extension: 48000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ontario Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 302
1315 Finch Avenue West
North York Ontario M3J 2G6
Phone: (416) 634-0001
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 300 York Mills Road
North York Ontario M2L 2Y5
Phone: (416) 391-4452
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 300
1131A Leslie Street
North York Ontario M3C 3L8
Phone: (416) 527-2263
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Crescent Oral Surgery
Suite 400
9251 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9T3
Phone: (905) 889-8806
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1188B Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6C 2E3
Phone: (416) 785-7864
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 505
3200 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B2
Phone: (416) 256-9500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 602
1235 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3K4
Phone: (416) 928-3444
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Freilich Dental Associates
55 St. Clair Ave. W. #125
Toronto Ontario M4V2Y7
Phone: (416) 789-5335
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Herzig Eye Clinic
Suite 210
131 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M5S 1R1
Phone: (416) 929-2020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 201
1490 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1N4
Phone: (416) 461-0424
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 31
70 Yorkville Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3R 1B9
Phone: (647) 343-0207
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 08 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grant Maxted Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Maxted (CPSO#: 51055 )
Business Address: 101 - 133 Hazelton Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5R 0A6
Business Address: 1089 Kingston Road
Toronto Ontario M1N 4E4
Business Address: 210 - 131 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M5R 1R1
(416) 929-2020
Business Address: 125-55 St. Clair West
Toronto Ontario M5S 1R1
Business Address: 343-50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3C2
Business Address: 301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3
(416) 486-8088
Business Address: 201 - 1490 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1N4
(416) 461-0424
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Address: 300 York Mills Road
North York Ontario M2L 2Y5
(416) 391-4452
Business Address: 251 Davenport Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 1J9
Business Address: 250 Canarctic Drive
North York Ontario M3J 2P4
Business Address: 400 - 9251 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9T3
(905) 889-8006
Business Address: 1188B Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6C 2E3
(416) 785-7864
Business Address: 214-10 York Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M2P 2G4
Business Address: 700-59 Hayden Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2P2
Business Address: 602 - 1235 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3K4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRANT ROYDEN MAXTED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAXTED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRANT ROYDEN MAXTED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAXTED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Otago, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 1979