THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:40:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 John Street
Suite 310
Thornhill Ontario L3T 5W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 881-9831
Fax: (905) 886-5236

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aubrey Maze Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maze (CPSO#: 51058 )
Business Address: 310-300 John Street
Thornhill Ontario L3T 5W4
(905) 881-9831

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 John Street
Suite 310
Thornhill Ontario L3T 5W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 881-9831
Fax: (905) 886-5236

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aubrey Maze Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maze (CPSO#: 51058 )
Business Address: 310-300 John Street
Thornhill Ontario L3T 5W4
(905) 881-9831

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AUBREY HERZL MAZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AUBREY HERZL MAZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1980