THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:05:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-6014

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 04 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mazer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mazer (CPSO#: 51059 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5825

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-6014

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 04 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mazer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mazer (CPSO#: 51059 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5825

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CYRIL DAVID MAZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CYRIL DAVID MAZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982