THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 13:27:49 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Westmount Family Physicians
Suite 254
785 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 1M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 272-0272
Fax: (519) 601-6288

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan E. MacLean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. MacLean (CPSO#: 51075 )
Business Address: Westmount Family Physicians
254 - 785 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 1M6
(226) 272-0272

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Westmount Family Physicians
Suite 254
785 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 1M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 272-0272
Fax: (519) 601-6288

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan E. MacLean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. MacLean (CPSO#: 51075 )
Business Address: Westmount Family Physicians
254 - 785 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 1M6
(226) 272-0272

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN ELIZABETH ADAMS MACLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN ELIZABETH ADAMS MACLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1982