THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:25:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6C 6B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 58525
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339 westminster ave london ontario
London Ontario N6C 2R5
Phone: (519) 858-8370
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 03 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory McCabe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. McCabe (CPSO#: 51088 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6C 6B5
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6C 6B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 58525
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339 westminster ave london ontario
London Ontario N6C 2R5
Phone: (519) 858-8370
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 03 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory McCabe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. McCabe (CPSO#: 51088 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6C 6B5
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY PAUL MCCABE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCABE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY PAUL MCCABE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCABE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 1982