THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2520 Eglinton Ave W
Unit 5
Mississauga ON L5M 0Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 820 3416
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 23 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian McGoey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. McGoey (CPSO#: 51101 )

Corporation Name: Brian McGoey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. McGoey (CPSO#: 51101 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2520 Eglinton Ave W
Unit 5
Mississauga ON L5M 0Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 820 3416
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 23 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian McGoey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. McGoey (CPSO#: 51101 )

Corporation Name: Brian McGoey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. McGoey (CPSO#: 51101 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN VINCENT MCGOEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGOEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN VINCENT MCGOEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGOEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982