THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:05:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: City of Kawartha Lakes Family Healt
55 Angeline Street North, Unit 2
Lindsay, ON
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 328-9855
Fax: 705-328-9401

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Albert Lauwers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lauwers (CPSO#: 51129 )
Business Address: City of Kawartha Lakes Family Health Team
Unit 2
55 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 2N6
(705) 328-9853
Business Address: Scarborough Health Network
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: City of Kawartha Lakes Family Healt
55 Angeline Street North, Unit 2
Lindsay, ON
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 328-9855
Fax: 705-328-9401

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Albert Lauwers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lauwers (CPSO#: 51129 )
Business Address: City of Kawartha Lakes Family Health Team
Unit 2
55 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 2N6
(705) 328-9853
Business Address: Scarborough Health Network
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBERT EDWARD LAUWERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAUWERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBERT EDWARD LAUWERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAUWERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982