THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erik W. Mulder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mulder (CPSO#: 51135 )
Business Address: 89 Dawson Road
Suite 106
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
(519) 836-5992
Business Address: 3 Brady Lane
Guelph ON N1L 1A2
519-822-2585

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erik W. Mulder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mulder (CPSO#: 51135 )
Business Address: 89 Dawson Road
Suite 106
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
(519) 836-5992
Business Address: 3 Brady Lane
Guelph ON N1L 1A2
519-822-2585

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIK WOUTER MULDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIK WOUTER MULDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982