THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:30:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8637 COUNTY ROAD 91
Stayner Ontario L0M 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705)428-6882
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8637 County Road 91
Stayner Ontario L0M 1S0
Phone: 705-428-6882
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 23 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hugh McLachlin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. McLachlin (CPSO#: 51169 )
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5P 3W2
(519) 631-2020
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9802
Business Address: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
(705) 445-2550

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8637 COUNTY ROAD 91
Stayner Ontario L0M 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705)428-6882
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8637 County Road 91
Stayner Ontario L0M 1S0
Phone: 705-428-6882
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 23 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hugh McLachlin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. McLachlin (CPSO#: 51169 )
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5P 3W2
(519) 631-2020
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9802
Business Address: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
(705) 445-2550

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUGH ANGUS MCLACHLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLACHLIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUGH ANGUS MCLACHLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLACHLIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981