THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:12:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Otago, 1978
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209 - 170 The Donway West
Toronto Ontario M3C 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 975-1544
Fax: (416) 975-8341

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 05 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M.K. MCLEAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McLean (CPSO#: 51172 )
Business Address: 209-170 The Donway West
Toronto Ontario M3C 2J2
416-975-1544

Corporation Name: Dr. M.K. McLean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Otago, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209 - 170 The Donway West
Toronto Ontario M3C 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 975-1544
Fax: (416) 975-8341

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 05 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M.K. MCLEAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McLean (CPSO#: 51172 )
Business Address: 209-170 The Donway West
Toronto Ontario M3C 2J2
416-975-1544

Corporation Name: Dr. M.K. McLean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY KATHRYN MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY KATHRYN MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Otago, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981