THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:40:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 683 Gainsborough Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 2Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058079640
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Kim McMillan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. McMillan (CPSO#: 51177 )
Business Address: 683 Gainsborough Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 2Y9
9058079640
Business Address: 683 Gainsborough Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 2Y9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 683 Gainsborough Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 2Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058079640
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Kim McMillan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. McMillan (CPSO#: 51177 )
Business Address: 683 Gainsborough Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 2Y9
9058079640
Business Address: 683 Gainsborough Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 2Y9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON KIM MCMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMILLAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON KIM MCMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 1985

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1984

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982