THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:38:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brantford General Hospital
Department Of Diagnostic Radiology
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 752-7871
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System Willett Site Paris
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System Willett Site
LOCATION: Paris

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lewis Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Miller (CPSO#: 51201 )
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5503

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brantford General Hospital
Department Of Diagnostic Radiology
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 752-7871
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System Willett Site Paris
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System Willett Site
LOCATION: Paris

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lewis Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Miller (CPSO#: 51201 )
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5503

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID LEWIS GEORGE MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID LEWIS GEORGE MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979