THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:52:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Athens, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
Child and Teen Clinic G2
G2
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-469-6590
Fax: 416-469-6591

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd
1 High Meadow Place
Unit 13
Toronto, ON
M9L 0A3
Phone: 1(800) 775-0093
Date Received: 29 May 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Petrou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Petrou (CPSO#: 51329 )
Business Address: Suite 210
3852 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1T 3T9
(416) 297-5511
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Hospital Clinic
Department of Paediatrics
G2
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
416-469-6590

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: University of Athens, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
Child and Teen Clinic G2
G2
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-469-6590
Fax: 416-469-6591

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd
1 High Meadow Place
Unit 13
Toronto, ON
M9L 0A3
Phone: 1(800) 775-0093
Date Received: 29 May 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Petrou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Petrou (CPSO#: 51329 )
Business Address: Suite 210
3852 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1T 3T9
(416) 297-5511
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Hospital Clinic
Department of Paediatrics
G2
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
416-469-6590

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CONSTANTINE SAVVA PETROU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETROU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CONSTANTINE SAVVA PETROU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETROU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Athens, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 1982