THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 05:10:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department Of Surgery
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
K7L 2V7
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 3395
Fax: (613) 548-2526

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Pichora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pichora (CPSO#: 51338 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Surgery
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 3396

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department Of Surgery
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
K7L 2V7
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 3395
Fax: (613) 548-2526

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Pichora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pichora (CPSO#: 51338 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Surgery
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 3396

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID RALSTON PICHORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PICHORA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID RALSTON PICHORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PICHORA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978