THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:50:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital
Department Of Laboratory Medicine
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Extension: 43200
Fax: (705) 739-5685

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 09 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Russell Price Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Price (CPSO#: 51390 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 739-6737

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital
Department Of Laboratory Medicine
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Extension: 43200
Fax: (705) 739-5685

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 09 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Russell Price Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Price (CPSO#: 51390 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 739-6737

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSSELL GIFFORD PRICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRICE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSSELL GIFFORD PRICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRICE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1982