THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:10:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2nd Floor
101 McIntyre Street West
North Bay Ontario P1B 2Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 472-7577
Extension: 7500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. A. Demers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Demers (CPSO#: 51409 )
Business Address: 2nd Floor
101 McIntyre Street West
North Bay Ontario P1B 2Y5
(705) 495-7500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2nd Floor
101 McIntyre Street West
North Bay Ontario P1B 2Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 472-7577
Extension: 7500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. A. Demers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Demers (CPSO#: 51409 )
Business Address: 2nd Floor
101 McIntyre Street West
North Bay Ontario P1B 2Y5
(705) 495-7500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRUCE ADELARD DEMERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRUCE ADELARD DEMERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981