THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:11:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1974
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 36379
Fax: (519) 663-2930

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 10 Dec 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.G. Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Joseph (CPSO#: 51429 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 36379

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 36379
Fax: (519) 663-2930

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 10 Dec 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.G. Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Joseph (CPSO#: 51429 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 36379

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIAMMA GEORGE JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIAMMA GEORGE JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Kerala, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 1986

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 1980