THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3476 Glen Erin Drive
Suite 230 Upper Level
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 820-3822
Fax: (905) 820-7623
Address: 1-1903 Ironoak Way
Oakville ON L6H 0N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Francis T. Lau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Lau (CPSO#: 51442 )
Business Address: Suite 230
3476 Glen Erin Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R4
(905) 820-3822

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3476 Glen Erin Drive
Suite 230 Upper Level
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 820-3822
Fax: (905) 820-7623
Address: 1-1903 Ironoak Way
Oakville ON L6H 0N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Francis T. Lau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Lau (CPSO#: 51442 )
Business Address: Suite 230
3476 Glen Erin Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R4
(905) 820-3822

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCIS TING YU LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCIS TING YU LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982