THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:18:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054452550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Phone: 705-445-2550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3950 Grand Park Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M6
Phone: 4162313369
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1020 Johnson's Lane, Bldg. C.
Mississauga Ontario L5J 2P7
Phone: 4162313369
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5055 Plantation Place, Building C,
Mississauga Ontario L5M 6J3
Phone: 905-279-1144
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 123 Rexdale Boulevard, Unit 6
Rexdale Ontario M9W 1P1
Phone: 4162313369
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Murray Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Miller (CPSO#: 51448 )
Business Address: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
(705) 444-0019
Business Address: 3950 Grand Park Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M6
(905) 896-2900
Business Address: 5055 Plantation Place
Building C
Mississauga Ontario L5M 6J3
(905) 279-1144
Business Address: Radiology Associates Clarkson
1020 Johnson's Lane
Building C
Mississauga Ontario L5J 2P7
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre - West Toronto
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Business Address: Radiology Associates Etobicoke
LF01 - 85 The East Mall
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 5W4
(416) 621-3961
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Address: Radiology Associates Rexdale
6 - 123 Rexdale Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 1P1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054452550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Phone: 705-445-2550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3950 Grand Park Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M6
Phone: 4162313369
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1020 Johnson's Lane, Bldg. C.
Mississauga Ontario L5J 2P7
Phone: 4162313369
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5055 Plantation Place, Building C,
Mississauga Ontario L5M 6J3
Phone: 905-279-1144
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 123 Rexdale Boulevard, Unit 6
Rexdale Ontario M9W 1P1
Phone: 4162313369
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Murray Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Miller (CPSO#: 51448 )
Business Address: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
(705) 444-0019
Business Address: 3950 Grand Park Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M6
(905) 896-2900
Business Address: 5055 Plantation Place
Building C
Mississauga Ontario L5M 6J3
(905) 279-1144
Business Address: Radiology Associates Clarkson
1020 Johnson's Lane
Building C
Mississauga Ontario L5J 2P7
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre - West Toronto
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Business Address: Radiology Associates Etobicoke
LF01 - 85 The East Mall
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 5W4
(416) 621-3961
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Address: Radiology Associates Rexdale
6 - 123 Rexdale Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 1P1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MURRAY HOWARD MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MURRAY HOWARD MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982