THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:44:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2637
Fax: (613) 738-4297

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 16 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Joseph Reisman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Reisman (CPSO#: 51489 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2637
Fax: (613) 738-4297

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 16 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Joseph Reisman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Reisman (CPSO#: 51489 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN JOSEPH REISMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REISMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN JOSEPH REISMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REISMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 May 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980