THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:42:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Springhurst Ave
306
Ottawa ON K1S 5V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196365236
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.C. Rosenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Rosenberg (CPSO#: 51513 )
Business Address: 60 Springhurst Avenue
Ste 306
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5V7
5196365236

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Springhurst Ave
306
Ottawa ON K1S 5V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196365236
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.C. Rosenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Rosenberg (CPSO#: 51513 )
Business Address: 60 Springhurst Avenue
Ste 306
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5V7
5196365236

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HERSCHEL CHARLES ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HERSCHEL CHARLES ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Jun 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1978