THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:03:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-853-2322
Fax: 905-853-7311

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David A. Rouselle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rouselle (CPSO#: 51527 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 301 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
(905) 853-2322
Business Address: 100-679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2R2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-853-2322
Fax: 905-853-7311

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David A. Rouselle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rouselle (CPSO#: 51527 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 301 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
(905) 853-2322
Business Address: 100-679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2R2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ALEXANDER ROUSELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUSELLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ALEXANDER ROUSELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUSELLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981