THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:11:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurosurgery
555 University Avenue
Suite 1503
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6425
Fax: (416) 813-4975

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 06 Dec 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James T. Rutka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rutka (CPSO#: 51545 )
Business Address: Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurosurgery
1503 - 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-6425

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurosurgery
555 University Avenue
Suite 1503
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6425
Fax: (416) 813-4975

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 06 Dec 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James T. Rutka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rutka (CPSO#: 51545 )
Business Address: Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurosurgery
1503 - 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-6425

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES THOMAS RUTKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUTKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES THOMAS RUTKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUTKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 1989

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1982