THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:30:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
Digestive Diseases, Room 2F57
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73837
Fax: (905) 523-6048

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B.J. Salena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Salena (CPSO#: 51557 )
Business Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Room 2F57
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73837

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
Digestive Diseases, Room 2F57
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73837
Fax: (905) 523-6048

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B.J. Salena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Salena (CPSO#: 51557 )
Business Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Room 2F57
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73837

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRUNO JOHN SALENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALENA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRUNO JOHN SALENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALENA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981