THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:27:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Peruana Cayetano Heredia University, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunningdale Health& Wellness Centre
1695 Wonderland Rd. North
Unit 2B
London Ontario N6G 4W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (888) 286-1067
Fax: (866) 692-3463
Address: 1001 Ridgeway St. E
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 5H8
Phone: (888) 286-1067
Fax: (866) 692-3463

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Belda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Belda (CPSO#: 51576 )
Business Address: 1001 Ridgeway Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 5H8
(888) 286-1067
Business Address: 59 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 1B7
(888) 286-1067
Business Address: 1695 Wonderland Road North
London Ontario N6G 4N3
(888) 286-1067

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Peruana Cayetano Heredia University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunningdale Health& Wellness Centre
1695 Wonderland Rd. North
Unit 2B
London Ontario N6G 4W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (888) 286-1067
Fax: (866) 692-3463
Address: 1001 Ridgeway St. E
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 5H8
Phone: (888) 286-1067
Fax: (866) 692-3463

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Belda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Belda (CPSO#: 51576 )
Business Address: 1001 Ridgeway Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 5H8
(888) 286-1067
Business Address: 59 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 1B7
(888) 286-1067
Business Address: 1695 Wonderland Road North
London Ontario N6G 4N3
(888) 286-1067

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTONIO ALFREDO BELDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTONIO ALFREDO BELDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Peruana Cayetano Heredia University, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1977
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 1977