THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 302
1265 Arthur Street East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 6E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 623-3744
Fax: (807) 622-6885

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blair Schoales Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Schoales (CPSO#: 51591 )
Business Address: 302 - 1265 Arthur Street East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 6E7
(807) 623-3744

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 302
1265 Arthur Street East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 6E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 623-3744
Fax: (807) 622-6885

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blair Schoales Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Schoales (CPSO#: 51591 )
Business Address: 302 - 1265 Arthur Street East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 6E7
(807) 623-3744

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BLAIR ROBERT SCHOALES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHOALES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BLAIR ROBERT SCHOALES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHOALES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 1985

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982